Hadi, Annie Zehra (CPSO#: 96909)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Vital Care Medical
Unit 5B
883 Mulock Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8S3
Phone: (905) 235-3825
Fax: (905) 235-3942
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Annie Hadi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 24 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hadi ( CPSO# 96909 )

Business Address:
Vital Care Medical
Unit 5B
883 Mulock Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8S3
Phone Number: (905) 235-3825

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNIE ZEHRA HADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HADI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2011 to 22 Jan 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 15 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Dec 2014 to 11 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 12 Jan 2015 to 21 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015