skip to content

Hader, Walter John

CPSO#: 17224

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 1996
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 May 1996

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 16 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1959
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Sep 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jul 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1996