skip to content

Haddon, Roger Wilson Thomas

CPSO#: 21660

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Aug 2012

Summary

Date of Death: 28-Jan-2017

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Durham, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2012