skip to content

Haddad, Elias

CPSO#: 99365

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Aug 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Technion-Israel Institute of Technology, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2012 to 08 Nov 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 09 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2013