skip to content

Hachinski, Vladimir

CPSO#: 20916

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Jun 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Jun 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education: University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
339-291 Windermere Rd
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
Room B7-003
London ON  N6G 2J9 Electoral District: 02
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto, ON  M4N 3M5

OR

University Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
London, ON  N6A 5A5
Date Received: 21 May 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:01 Jan 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VLADIMIR HACHINSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HACHINSKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2021