Hachey, John Daniel (CPSO#: 100864)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Couchiching Family Health Team
Unit 103
119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone: 705-326-3549
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 2 55 Highway 118 West
Bracebridge ON  P1L 1T2
Canada
Phone: (705) 645-1027
Fax: (705) 646-2543
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05

Little Lake Health Centre
11 Lakeside Terrace
Suite 201
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Canada
Phone: 7058819810
Fax: 7058819813
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Hachey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Dickinson ( CPSO# 100878)
Dr. J. Hachey ( CPSO# 100864)

Business Address:
Couchiching Family Health Team
Unit 103
119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone Number: (705) 326-3549

Business Address:
Orillia Paediatric Teaching Associates
17 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 327-9131

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN DANIEL HACHEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HACHEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015