skip to content

Habibullah, Zainab Noor S

CPSO#: 96042

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Sep 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Umm Al-Qura University Faculty of Medici, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
PEAP - CF - Nephrology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Nephrology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Nephrology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Nephrology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015