skip to content

Habib, Wasif Muhammad

CPSO#: 91961

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 27 Jun 2018
EXPIRY DATE
27 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 Jan 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Sci & Technology, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 04 Aug 2009 to 26 Oct 2009
AVP - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 27 Oct 2009 to 03 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 04 Aug 2010 to 03 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 04 Aug 2011 to 03 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 04 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 03 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 04 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Jun 2018