skip to content

Haberer, Kim Lori

CPSO#: 99389

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
The Credit Valley Hospital
Pediatric Medicine Clinic
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 02 Nov 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KIM LORI HABERER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABERER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 24 Sep 2012 to 05 Oct 2012
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2018