skip to content

Haber, Gregory Bartholomew

CPSO#: 23667

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Jun 1971
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1971

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
530 1st Avenue
NYU Langone Health
Gastroenterology Associates
Skirball Suite 7R
New York NY  10016
United States
Phone: 6465012465

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:05 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:27 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GREGORY BARTHOLOMEW HABER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1971