skip to content

Randhawa, Harkamal Kaur

CPSO#: 74322

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Jun 2003
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
155 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 3A4
Phone: (289) 389-8900
Fax: (289) 389-7700 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Randhawa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 13 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Randhawa ( CPSO# 74322 )
Dr. T. Davies ( CPSO# 77744 )

Business Address:
Suite 103
155 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 3A4
Phone Number: (289) 389-8900


Corporation Name: T. Davies Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Randhawa ( CPSO# 74322 )
Dr. A. Davies ( CPSO# 23646 )
Dr. T. Davies ( CPSO# 77744 )

Business Address:
Henderson Hospital
Section B3 Room 147
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 May 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HARKAMAL KAUR RANDHAWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANDHAWA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 1999 to 31 May 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 2000 to 31 May 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 2001 to 31 May 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 2002 to 31 May 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2003