skip to content

Mithoowani, Hamid Mithu

CPSO#: 98344

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Medical Oncology
835 King St W
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4380 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mohamed Mithoowani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mithoowani ( CPSO# 100474)
Dr. H. Mithoowani ( CPSO# 98344 )
Dr. M. Mithoowani ( CPSO# 27305 )

Business Address:
17 Frank Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 2R2
Phone Number: (519) 245-3370


Corporation Name: Hamid Mithoowani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 06 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Mithoowani ( CPSO# 98344 )

Business Address:
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Medical Oncology
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (613) 513-6633

Business Address:
Unit 1
17 Frank Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 2R2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 27 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HAMID MITHU MITHOOWANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITHOOWANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2016