skip to content

Lim, Hilda Hue-Ching

CPSO#: 88825

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
4631 Steeles Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1V 4S5
Phone: (416) 293-6600 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Bill Lim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lim ( CPSO# 31635 )
Dr. H. Lim ( CPSO# 88825 )
Dr. J. Lim ( CPSO# 114092)

Business Address:
302B - 280 Spadina Avenue
Toronto ON  M5T 3A5
Phone Number: (416) 977-9888

Business Address:
4631 Steeles Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1V 4S5
Phone Number: (416) 293-6600


Corporation Name: Dr. Hilda Lim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Lim ( CPSO# 88825 )

Business Address:
Suite 102
4631 Steeles Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1V 4S5
Phone Number: (416) 293-6600

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HILDA HUE-CHING LIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010