skip to content

Kazmie, Huma

CPSO#: 80336

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Mar 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Aligarh Muslim University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2285 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V2
Phone: (519) 253-6112
Fax: (519) 253-6335 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

VCare Paediatric Walk iin Clinic
Suite 2.
2285 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V2
Canada
Phone: 5192547979
Fax: 519 2540488
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Huma Kazmie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:01 Mar 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HUMA KAZMIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAZMIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 15 Dec 2003 to 14 Jun 2004
International Specialist Physician - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008