skip to content

Joshi, Harshad Pranshanker

CPSO#: 53781

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Apr 1984
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1987

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Swahili

Education:University of Nairobi, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Medical Clinic
1608 Tecumseh Road West
Windsor ON  N9B 1T8
Phone: (519) 258-4400
Fax: (519) 973-3914 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Medical Clinic
6720 Hawthorne
Windsor ON  N8T 1J9
Canada
Phone: (519) 944-2295
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Harshad Joshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Joshi ( CPSO# 53781 )

Business Address:
1608 Tecumseh Road West
Windsor ON  N9B 1T8
Phone Number: (519) 258-4400

Business Address:
6720 Hawthorne Drive
Windsor ON  N8T 1J9


Corporation Name: Chopra, Joshi, Karnik, & Lamont, Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 15 2005
Corporation Name: Chopra, Joshi, Karnik & Lamont Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 26 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chopra ( CPSO# 31096 )
Dr. J. Lamont ( CPSO# 31730 )
Dr. H. Joshi ( CPSO# 53781 )
Dr. V. Karnik ( CPSO# 60518 )

Business Address:
Windsor Medical Clinic
1608 Tecumseh Road West
Windsor ON  N9B 1T8
Phone Number: (519) 258-4400

Business Address:
6720 Hawthorne Avenue
Windsor ON  N8T 1J9
Phone Number: (519) 944-2295


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HARSHAD PRANSHANKER JOSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSHI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1987