skip to content

Hamami, Hannah

CPSO#: 113527

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Jul 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Saint James School of Medicine St Vincen, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Discovery Family Health
77 Provost Drive
Toronto ON  M2K 0B7
Phone: (416) 901-7407
Fax: (416) 901-9780 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mohajer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Hamami ( CPSO# 113527)
Dr. P. Mohajer ( CPSO# 101263)

Business Address:
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
77 Provost Drive
Toronto ON  M2K 0B7
Phone Number: (416) 901-7407

Business Address:
7075 Rexwood Road
Mississauga ON  L4T 4M1
Phone Number: (905) 293-9663

Business Address:
Suite 100
1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 3C2
Phone Number: (416) 291-7719

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HANNAH HAMAMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMAMI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 31 Jul 2017 to 27 Aug 2017
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2018