skip to content

Grover, Harpreet Singh

CPSO#: 84970

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 132
150 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X8
Phone: (519) 938-5644
Fax: (519) 938-5641 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: H.S. Grover Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Grover ( CPSO# 84970 )
Dr. N. Gill ( CPSO# 96077 )

Business Address:
Suite 132
150 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X8
Phone Number: (519) 938-5644

Business Address:
712 Main Street East
Shelburne ON  L9V 2Z4
Phone Number: (226) 259-9000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HARPREET SINGH GROVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROVER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011