skip to content

Gangam, Hema Malini

CPSO#: 87567

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Aug 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 08 Aug 2007
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Mysore University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 366
1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 5A6
Phone: (519) 973-1133
Fax: (519) 973-1255 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: H. Gangam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Gangam ( CPSO# 87567 )

Business Address:
366 - 1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 5A6
Phone Number: (519) 973-1133

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 08 Aug 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Aug 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Nov 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Feb 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 05 Feb 2010

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 05 Feb 2010 Active
             Dr. Hema Malini Gangam may practise medicine independently in Neurology, only.

The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.