skip to content

Dukic, Helena

CPSO#: 87885

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Jan 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:University of Belgrade, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gibb St
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

1006 Avenue Rd
Toronto ON  M5P 2K8
Canada
Phone: 647-350-5500
Fax: 416-981-3322
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Helena Dukic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Dukic ( CPSO# 87885 )

Business Address:
Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone Number: (905) 579-1212

Business Address:
203 - 505 Eglinton Ave. W.
Toronto ON  M5N 1B1
Phone Number: (647) 385-0550

Business Address:
1006 Avenue Rd
Toronto ON  M5P 2K8
Phone Number: 647-350-5500

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:04 Jan 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HELENA DUKIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUKIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2007 to 11 Feb 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Feb 2008 to 19 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2008 to 19 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2010