skip to content

Boyd, Hugh Flexman

CPSO#: 89284

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
56 Governor's Road
Dundas ON  L9H5G7
Phone: 9056273541 Ext. 2218
Fax: 905628-0825 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

329 Parkside Drive
Waterdown ON  L0R 2H0
Canada
Phone: (905) 689-2662
Fax: (905) 689-2625
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

100 Westmount Road
Guelph ON  N1H 5H8
Canada
Phone: 5198246000 Ext. 4080
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Hugh Boyd Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Boyd ( CPSO# 89284 )

Business Address:
2025 Guelph Line
Burlington ON  L7P 4M8
Phone Number: (905) 681-7755

Business Address:
187 Sour Springs Road
Mount Pleasant ON  N0E K0
Phone Number: 905-906-6161

Business Address:
56 Governor's Road
Dundas ON  L9H 5G7
Phone Number: (905) 927-9011

Business Address:
329 Parkside Drive
Waterdown ON  L0R 2H0
Phone Number: (905) 689-2662

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Health Centre,Guelph Guelph
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HUGH FLEXMAN BOYD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2010