skip to content

Gwyn, Alice Bond Jermy

CPSO#: 97226

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Aug 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:Queen's University Belfast School of Med, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northern Appointment Clinic
4 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1K8
Phone: (807) 737-5182
Fax: 8077372994 Electoral District: 09

Medical Records Location

Address: 79 Fifth Avenue Sioux Lookout, ON P8T 1K9
Date Received: 16 May 2014

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:27 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALICE BOND JERMY GWYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GWYN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2016