skip to content

Gvozdic, Dusanka

CPSO#: 95138

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Jan 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Jan 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Belgrade, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
400 Bronte St South
Suite 209
Milton ON  L9T 0H7
Phone: 905-636-1888
Fax: 905-636-1124 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Gvozdic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Gvozdic ( CPSO# 95138 )

Business Address:
209-400 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 0H7
Phone Number: (905) 636-1888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DUSANKA GVOZDIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GVOZDIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2014