skip to content

Guttman, Rachelle

CPSO#: 86752

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Jan 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jan 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Toronto
Koffler Student Service Centre
Main Floor
214 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2Z9
Phone: (416) 978-8030
Fax: (416) 978-7341 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital
Sherman Health & Wellness Centre
9600 Bathurst Street, Suite 300
Vaughan ON  L6A 3Z8
Canada
Phone: 289-269-1522
Fax: 905-303-9773
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:01 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RACHELLE GUTTMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUTTMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2014