skip to content

Gurtu, Vikram

CPSO#: 94889

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2020
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2022
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Cardiology
585 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:18 Oct 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VIKRAM GURTU shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. GURTU is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. GURTU shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. GURTU is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. GURTU shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. GURTU is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. GURTU no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2022.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 04 Apr 2011 to 29 Apr 2011
EL - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 19 Nov 2018 to 14 Dec 2018
EL - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2022