skip to content

Gurfinkel, Ronen

CPSO#: 88805

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham-Kingston Medical Centre
Suite 18
3545 Kingston Road
Scarborough ON  M1M 1R6
Phone: (416) 266-6600
Fax: (416) 266-6604 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Danforth Medical Centre
880 Danforth Road
Scarborough ON  M1K 1H8
Canada
Phone: 416-264-4848
Fax: 416-264-0547
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Kingston-Morningside Medical Centre
Suite 204
4500 Kingston Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 2N9
Canada
Phone: 416-287-3100
Fax: 416-287-1404
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Main Health Care
Unit 6
3400 Danforth Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1L 1E1
Canada
Phone: 416-693-3030
Fax: 416-693-3033
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Drs. Seitelbach and Gurfinkel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gurfinkel ( CPSO# 88805 )
Dr. M. Seitelbach ( CPSO# 88944 )

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
880 Danforth Road
Scarborough ON  M1K 1H8
Phone Number: (416) 246-4848

Business Address:
204-4500 Kingston Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 2N9
Phone Number: (416) 287-3100

Business Address:
3830 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1G 1R6
Phone Number: (416) 439-1243

Business Address:
301-294 Main Street
Toronto ON  M4C 4X5
Phone Number: (416) 693-3030

Business Address:
Markham-Kingston Medical Centre
Suite 18
3545 Kingston Road
Toronto ON  M1M 1R6
Phone Number: (416) 266-6600

Business Address:
Oncology Clinic - Tower 1
The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-8113

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RONEN GURFINKEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GURFINKEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2012