skip to content

Gupta-Bhatnagar, Shikha

CPSO#: 92806

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Gupta, Shikha (used until: 11 Feb 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4J9
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 756-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Gupta-Bhatnagar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gupta-Bhatnagar ( CPSO# 92806 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHIKHA GUPTA-BHATNAGAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA-BHATNAGAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2015