skip to content

Gupta, Vasudha

CPSO#: 92807

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Aug 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Ophthalmology
166 Brock St
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: 613 544-3400 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: V. Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 18 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Gupta ( CPSO# 92807 )

Business Address:
725 Arlington Park Place
Kingston ON  K7M 7E4
Phone Number: (613) 417-3451

Medical Records Location

Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital, 166 Brock Street, Kingston, ON, K7L 5G2
Date Received: 31 May 2016


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VASUDHA GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2019