skip to content

Gupta, Sunjay

CPSO#: 96975

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Oct 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 25 Oct 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University School of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grandview Medical Centre FHT
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 3H7
Phone: (519) 623-4200
Fax: (519) 623-2546 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Monkhouse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 17 2017
Corporation Name: Dr. Sunjay Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gupta ( CPSO# 96975 )

Business Address:
Grandview Medical Centre FHT
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1H 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 623-4200

Business Address:
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Oct 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 24 Jun 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2013 Active
 Dr.  Sunjay Gupta may practise medicine independently in family medicine,
                  only.