Gupta, Shruti (CPSO#: 100658)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2901 Bayview Avenue
Po box 91130
North York ON  M2K 1E6
Phone: (416) 493-3611
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: 9058487100
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke General Hospital
Toronto ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: 416 747 3400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shruti Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gupta ( CPSO# 100658)

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 494-2120

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHRUTI GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2015