skip to content

Gupta, Saurabh

CPSO#: 96178

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Saurabh Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 16 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 20 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017