skip to content

Gupta, Rasna

CPSO#: 96656

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Aug 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 25 Aug 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Government Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
WIndsor Regional Cancer Centre
Medical Oncology Associates Group
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor ON  N8W 2X3
Phone: (519) 253-5253 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rasna Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gupta ( CPSO# 96656 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Cancer Centre
Medical Oncology Associates Group
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor ON  N8W 2X3
Phone Number: (519) 253-5253

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:25 Aug 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective:25 Aug 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Aug 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Feb 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 19 Feb 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Feb 2013 Active
                   Dr.  Rasna Gupta may practise medicine independently in internal medicine
                  and medical oncology, only.