skip to content

Gupta, Priya

CPSO#: 86913

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 Oct 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Delhi, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
CF - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jan 2011
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012