skip to content

Gupta, Nikhil

CPSO#: 99049

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 09 Jul 2012
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:All-India Institute of Medical Sciences, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canmed Multispecialty Clinics
8 Shadlock St (Unit 1)
Markham ON  L3S 3K9
Phone: (416) 599-5499
Fax: (416) 345-0071 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Canmed Multispecialty Clinics
18 Kensington Rd (Suite 105)
Brampton ON  L6T 4S5
Canada
Phone: (416) 599-5499
Fax: (416) 345-0071
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nikhil Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Gupta ( CPSO# 99049 )

Business Address:
Diabetes and Endocrinology Centre
8 Shadlock Street
Unit 1
Markham ON  L3S 3K9
Phone Number: (416) 599-5499

Business Address:
Bramalea Medical Centre
105 - 18 Kensington Road
Brampton ON  L6T 4S5
Phone Number: (416) 599-5499

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jul 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 09 Jul 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Dec 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Dec 2013

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Dec 2013 Active
             Dr.  Nikhil  Gupta may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and
            endocrinology and metabolism in an outpatient setting, only.