skip to content

Gupta, Michael Kaviraj

CPSO#: 89546

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Room G836
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 35854
Fax: (905) 521-6077 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gupta ( CPSO# 89546 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Room G836
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL KAVIRAJ GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2008