skip to content

Gupta, Maneesh Kumar

CPSO#: 89363

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ellesmere X-Ray Associates
Suite 15B
1815 Ironstone Manor
Pickering ON  L1W 3W9
Phone: 905-831-1800 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough Health Network
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-8131 Ext. 4134
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering
580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
Phone: (905) 683-2320 Ext. 1123
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
100 Frank Miller Dr
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Canada
Phone: (705) 789-2311
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Maneesh Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gupta ( CPSO# 89363 )

Business Address:
Ellesmere X-Ray Associates
Suite 15B
1815 Ironstone Manor
Pickering ON  L1W 3W9
Phone Number: (905) 831-1800

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4

Business Address:
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MANEESH KUMAR GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2014