skip to content

Gupta, Madhu

CPSO#: 97936

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Pertosa Drive
Brampton ON  L6X 0H9
Phone: (905) 451-1244 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. M. Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 16 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gupta ( CPSO# 97936 )

Business Address:
Suite 104
100 Pertosa Drive
Brampton ON  L6X 0H9
Phone Number: (905) 451-1244

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MADHU GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014