skip to content

Gupta, Lavita

CPSO#: 96429

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Oct 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Xavier University School of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 Terrace Hill
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: 5197515544 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Canada
Phone: 705-632-2015
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LAVITA GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 25 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 26 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 29 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 24 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 25 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 31 Aug 2015 to 27 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2016