skip to content

Gupta, Gaurav Vinod

CPSO#: 99481

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Oct 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 05 Oct 2012
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Nottingham, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHS Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: 9055212100 Ext. 46368 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Main Street West Urgent Care Centre
690 Main St W
Hamilton ON  L8S 1A4
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46368
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Juravinski Hospital
Emergency Department
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V1C3
Canada
Phone: 9055212100 Ext. 46368
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. G. Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Gupta ( CPSO# 99481 )

Business Address:
HHS Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 05 Oct 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Oct 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Apr 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2014 Active
             Dr.  Gaurav  Vinod  Gupta  may  practise  medicine  independently  in emergency
            medicine, only.