skip to content

Gupta, Aparna

CPSO#: 86666

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Ajax Pickering Hospital
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Fax: (905) 428-5335 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 206
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Canada
Phone: (416) 289-0185
Fax: (416) 289-0187
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
General Internal Medicine Clinic
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-3118
Fax: (416) 281-7384
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

19 Harwood Ave S
Ajax ON  L1S 2B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 311-1122
Fax: (905) 231-1124
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

399 Bathurst St
University Health Network, TWH
Divison of Neurology
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Aparna Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gupta ( CPSO# 86666 )

Business Address:
Rough Valley Health System
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Business Address:
19 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 231-1122

Business Address:
Rouge Valley-Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-3118

Business Address:
Suite 206
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 289-0185

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. APARNA GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012