skip to content

Gupta, Alok

CPSO#: 88719

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jan 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Feb 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Jammu University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100-2650 Bristol Cir
Oakville ON  L6H 6Z7
Phone: 9058292827
Fax: 905829 2831 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

1475 Upper Ottawa St.
Hamilton ON  L8W 3J6
Canada
Phone: (905) 575-1300
Fax: (905)528-3899
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

100 Main Street West 3rd Floor
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H6
Canada
Phone: 905-546-9885
Fax: 905-528-3899
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

34 Stone Church Road
Suite 203
Ancaster ON  L9K1S5
Canada
Phone: 9055278708
Fax: 9055275798
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

3027 Harvester Rd
Suite 506
Phone: 2892663036
Fax: 8559533537
County: 
Electoral District: 

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Alok Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gupta ( CPSO# 88719 )

Business Address:
#2B
880 Upper Wentworth Street
Hamilton ON  L9A 5H2
Phone Number: (905) 538-7650

Business Address:
1475 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton ON  L8W 3J6
Phone Number: (905) 575-1300

Business Address:
2315 Bristol Circle
Suite 102
Oakville ON  L6H 6P8
Phone Number: (905) 829-2827

Business Address:
100 Main Street West
3rd Floor
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H6
Phone Number: (905) 546-9885

Business Address:
688 Queensdale Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8V 1M1
Phone Number: (289) 396-9437

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:20 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALOK GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jan 2010 to 26 Mar 2010
AVP - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 27 Mar 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2013