skip to content

Gunaratnam, Senthuran

CPSO#: 96051

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Feb 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Feb 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Jaffna, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Health Network,
Centenary Site
Department of Psychiatry
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131 Ext. 5330
Fax: (416) 281-7320 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

DURHAM MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES
519 Brock Street South
Whitby ON  L1N4K8
Canada
Phone: 9056660831
Fax: 9056660831
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Senthuran Gunaratnam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gunaratnam ( CPSO# 96051 )

Business Address:
Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
616-2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
Durham Mental Health Services
519 Brock Street South
Whitby ON  L1N 4K8
Phone Number: (905) 666-0831

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:17 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SENTHURAN GUNARATNAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUNARATNAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 24 Oct 2011
AVP - Psychiatry

Western University, 25 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 18 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Western University, 19 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Western University, 29 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Western University, 29 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Western University, 01 Jul 2016 to 25 May 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 May 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Feb 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2020