skip to content

Gulati, Sanjiv Kumar

CPSO#: 92682

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 May 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 May 2010
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Himachal Pradesh University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
FORENSIC TREATMENT UNIT (FTU)
Brockville ON  K6V 5W7
Phone: (613) 345-1461 Ext. 2688
Fax: 613-345-7276 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Royal Ottawa Mental health Cent
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z7K4
Canada
Phone: 6137226521 Ext. 2688
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sanjiv Gulati Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gulati ( CPSO# 92682 )

Business Address:
St Lawrence Valley Correctional
and Treatment Centre
Secure Treatment Unit
P O Box 1050 1804 Highway 2 East
Brockville ON  K6V 5W7
Phone Number: (613) 341-2870

Business Address:
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 803-4860

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group,Brockville Mental Health Centre Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Forensic Psychiatry Effective: 01 May 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Jul 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 May 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Nov 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 27 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jul 2016

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jul 2016 Active
             Dr.  Sanjiv  Kumar Gulati may practise medicine independently in Psychiatry and
            Forensic Psychiatry.