skip to content

Gulati, Sanjiv Kumar

CPSO#: 92682

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 May 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 May 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Himachal Pradesh University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
FORENSIC TREATMENT UNIT (FTU)
Brockville ON  K6V 5W7
Phone: (613) 345-1461 Ext. 2688
Fax: 613-345-7276 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Royal Ottawa Mental health Cent
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z7K4
Canada
Phone: 6137226521 Ext. 2688
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sanjiv Gulati Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gulati ( CPSO# 92682 )

Business Address:
1809 Oxford Ave
FORENSIC TREATMENT UNIT
Brockville ON  K6V 5W7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group,Brockville Mental Health Centre Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Forensic Psychiatry Effective:01 May 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Psychiatry Effective:14 Jul 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 May 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Nov 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 27 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jul 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jul 2016 Active
 Dr.  Sanjiv  Kumar Gulati may practise medicine independently in Psychiatry and
            Forensic Psychiatry.