skip to content

Gulati, Brij Bhushan

CPSO#: 90300

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Mar 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 16 Mar 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Nagpur University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ross Memorial Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone: (705) 328-7321
Fax: (705) 328-7318 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Brij Bhushan Gulati Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 10 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Gulati ( CPSO# 90300 )

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Georgia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:16 Mar 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Mar 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Aug 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 06 Aug 2010 Active
             Dr.  Brij  Bhushan  Gulati  may  practise medicine independently in psychiatry,
            only.