skip to content

Gulamhusein, Aliya Fatemah

CPSO#: 90551

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto General Hospital
Suite 224
9th Floor, Eaton Building
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-340-3631
Fax: 416-340-3285 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Aliya Gulamhusein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gulamhusein ( CPSO# 90551 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Room 9-EN 224
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4868

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:06 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALIYA FATEMAH GULAMHUSEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GULAMHUSEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2013