skip to content

Guirguis, Hany Raafat Yacoub

CPSO#: 88722

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hematology/Oncology Clinic
Suite 105
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone: (416) 284-8131 Ext. 4666
Fax: (416) 281-7228 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective:12 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HANY RAAFAT YACOUB GUIRGUIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUIRGUIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Hematology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012