skip to content

Guirguis, Ezzat Fawzy

CPSO#: 30275

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French, Italian

Education:University of Alexandria, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Medical Records Department Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital 170 Colborne St W, Orillia ON L3V 2Z3
Date Received: 25 May 2017


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Egypt
Italy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:17 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017