Guindon, Melissa Marie Louise (CPSO#: 96227)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
750 Taylor Creek Drive
Orleans ON  K1C1T1
Phone: (613) 830-8388
Fax: (613) 830-8588
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Melissa Guindon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Guindon ( CPSO# 96227 )

Business Address:
Suite 2
750 Taylor Creek Drive
Ottawa ON  K1C 1T1
Phone Number: (613) 830-8388

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jul 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELISSA MARIE LOUISE GUINDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUINDON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2013