skip to content

Guigne, Francoise Claire

CPSO#: 98366

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 16 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 05 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 06 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 05 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 16 Aug 2018