skip to content

Guest, Arthur Barrie

CPSO#: 22413

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2004
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1965
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1965
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Mar 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Mar 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004